Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Nurse Shortage in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters relating to changes in the nursing profession that have resulted in a shortage of nurses in the State and nation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0928
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM