Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Food Deserts - Small Loans
Sponsored by
Delegates Hayes, Ali, Anderson, Conaway, Glenn, R. Lewis, McCray, McIntosh, Mosby, and Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Housing and Community Development to meet the funding obligations for sustainable communities and food deserts by using any specified financial assistance available to the Department; authorizing the Department to provide small loans under the Business Development Program that are not more than $50,000 per loan to approved entities for assistance in providing better access to healthy food in food deserts; and authorizing the Department to work with intermediaries to administer the specified small loans.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Food Deserts - Small Loans
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {570112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Food Deserts - Small Loans
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-15)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Housing and Community Development - Food Deserts - Small Loans
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Food Deserts - Small Loans
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {570112/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Food Deserts - Small Loans
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (118-15) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Text - Chapter - Housing and Community Development - Food Deserts - Small Loans
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-305, 6-307, 6-308, 6-308.1, 6-308.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM