Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Blue Ribbon Commission on School Transparency and Accountability
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Blue Ribbon Commission on School Transparency and Accountability to study best practices for promoting ethics, accountability, and transparency in State and local government; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2019; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Public School Transparency and Accountability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {825967/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {673028/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Blue Ribbon Commission on School Transparency and Accountability
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Public School Transparency and Accountability Act
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {825967/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {673028/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Blue Ribbon Commission on School Transparency and Accountability
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Referred Rules 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page