Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Angel, Atterbeary, Chang, Corderman, Cullison, Ebersole, Hayes, Hettleman, C. Howard, Jones, J. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, Morhaim, Patterson, Queen, Sanchez, Simonaire, Stein, Sydnor, Valderrama, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program; providing for the purpose of the pilot program; requiring the local departments of social services in Baltimore and Washington counties to implement the pilot program; requiring certain local departments of social services to refer certain children to the Regional Child Trafficking Advocate within a 24 hours of identification; requiring the Secretary of State, after consultation with certain entities, to appoint certain Advocates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0964
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot Program
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM