Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Contested Cases - Judicial Review
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Haynes, Healey, Kelly, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Sample-Hughes, and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a court may reverse or modify the decision of an agency in specified contested cases on judicial review under the Administrative Procedure Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0942
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {326982/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-44)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {326982/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 62
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (94-44) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM