Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Against Medical Cannabis Patients and Caregivers - Prohibition (Medical Cannabis Patient and Caregiver Antidiscrimination Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Luedtke, Angel, Brooks, Conaway, Cullison, Hayes, J. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, a certain employer from taking certain discriminatory actions against or otherwise penalizing a qualifying patient or caregiver based on the individual's status as a qualifying patient or caregiver or, with respect to a certain qualifying patient, a certain drug test result; authorizing certain individuals to file a complaint with the Commissioner of Labor and Industry; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Discrimination Against Medical Cannabis Patients and Caregivers - Prohibition (Medical Cannabis Patient and Caregiver Antidiscrimination Act)
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page