Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Commission to Study Campaign Finance Law) and Delegates Cardin, George, and Summers
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a candidate may join a slate or continue as a member of a slate only under specified circumstances; altering limits on the aggregate amount of contributions a person may make in an election cycle; requiring that contribution limits and transfer limits be adjusted in a specified manner at specified times; providing that contributions by two or more business entities be considered as being made by one contributor under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1039
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013, January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {145068/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744738/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744738/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744738/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {623027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Delegates Cardin, Summers, and George
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Senators Ferguson, Dyson, and Jennings
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-7)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-2)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/27/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {145068/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {744738/1 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {744738/1 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {744738/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {623027/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2) 60
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Delegates Cardin, Summers, and George 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Senators Ferguson, Dyson, and Jennings 66
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (128-7) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed (42-2) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 13-202, 13-207, 13-208.1, 13-209, 13-214, 13-220.1, 13-222, 13-226, 13-227, 13-228, 13-234, 13-235, 13-240, 13-301, 13-304, 13-305, 13-306, 13-307, 13-309, 13-309.1, 13-309.2, 13-327, 13-331, 13-340, 13-505, 13-604.1, 14-101, 14-102, 14-103, 14-104, 14-105, 14-106, 14-107, 14-108, 14-109, 2-102, 5-303, 9-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM