Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Angel, Chang, Gaines, Hayes, Haynes, Hill, Jackson, Krimm, B. Robinson, Sophocleus, Valentino-Smith, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified report on the Waiting List Equity Fund to include specified information regarding individuals in the crisis resolution category of the waiting list for developmental disabilities services; establishing mandated appropriations for developmental disabilities community services; requiring the mandated appropriations to be used to provide services to individuals in the crisis resolution category on the waiting list for developmental disabilities services; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0413
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205, 7-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM