Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, if a self-insured employer, insurer, or the Uninsured Employers' Fund has not waived third-party reimbursement, the Subsequent Injury Fund be reimbursed after the self-insured employer, insurer, or Uninsured Employers' Fund in a certain third-party action; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0979
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393696/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {393696/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48A
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Text - Chapter - Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM