Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Education - Child Safety Seat Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Barron, Ebersole, Gutierrez, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each hospital that provides services to a child under the age of 8 years, at the time of discharge of the child, to provide and discuss with the parent of the child or with the individual to whom the child is released certain information relating to child safety seats, seat belts, and the transportation of children in rear seats; providing that a hospital is not responsible for the failure of certain individuals to whom a child is released to properly transport the child; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospitals - Education - Child Safety Seat Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Hospitals - Education - Child Safety Seat Requirements
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-310.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM