Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study a Post-Labor Day Start Date for Maryland Public Schools
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Barve, Boteler, George, Hixson, Howard, Ivey, A. Miller, V. Turner, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study a Post-Labor Day Start Date for Maryland Public Schools; providing for the membership, chair, and staff for the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study issues relating to a post-Labor Day start date for Maryland public schools; and requiring the Task Force to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2014.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0963
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {555662/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Committee Amendment {555662/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-4)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/28/2013 3/01/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {555662/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Committee Amendment {555662/1 Withdrawn 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-4) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM