Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Nathan-Pulliam, B. Robinson, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting recent high school graduates from payment of tuition to attend a community college in the State under specified circumstances; providing a 50% discount on tuition to unemployed individuals attending a community college in the State under specified circumstances; requiring the State to reimburse community colleges for foregone tuition revenue; requiring that funds used to reimburse community colleges shall be paid from the Education Trust Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM