Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Waldstreicher, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Hammen, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Krebs, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified persons from distributing specified tobacco products, paraphernalia, or coupons to a minor; providing that a person who violates a specified provision of the Act is subject to specified civil penalties; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in collaboration and consultation with specified agencies, to develop specified strategies; requiring the Department to report on specified strategies on or before October 1 each year; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {133898/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {673922/1 Rejected (49-87)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-18)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {133898/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {673922/1 Rejected (49-87) 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (119-18) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 56
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-107, 10-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM