Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - State Reinsurance Program and Health Insurance Subsidy Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Hammen
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Substituting the Health Insurance Subsidy Program for the State Reinsurance Program in specified provisions of law relating to funding of the State Reinsurance Program; authorizing the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, with the approval of the Maryland Insurance Commissioner, to establish the Health Insurance Subsidy Program to take effect on or after January 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/14 at 12:30 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-502, 14-504, 31-107, 31-117, 31-120 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM