Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Individual Exchange – Copper Plans to Lower Rates
Sponsored by
Delegates Morgan, Szeliga, Adams, Arentz, Buckel, Fisher, Grammer, Hornberger, Kipke, Krebs, Malone, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Reilly, Rey, Saab, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, beginning January 1, 2019, to make copper plans available in the Individual Exchange to certain individuals, notwithstanding certain provisions of law; requiring the Exchange to certify a certain health benefit plan as a copper plan if the plan provides certain coverage, notwithstanding certain provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018, January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Individual Exchange – Copper Plans to Lower Rates
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1303, 31-101, 31-108, 31-113.1, 31-115, 31-115.1, 31-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM