Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Sponsored by
Delegate Mautz (By Request)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain provision of law limiting the amount of a finder's fee that may be charged by a mortgage broker obtaining a mortgage loan with respect to the same property more than once within a 24-month period.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0203 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103792/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {103792/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
Text - Chapter - Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM