Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Arts and Entertainment Districts - Qualifying Residing Artists
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Frick, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of qualifying residing artist for an arts and entertainment district to include individuals who own or rent residential real property in the State and who conduct business and derive income in specified areas; altering the eligibility for specified individuals to claim specified tax incentives; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1054
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {205660/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-6)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Robey) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/27/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {205660/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (124-6) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Robey) Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Second Reading Passed 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-701, 4-706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM