Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Health Record and Payment Clearing House - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Brooks, Flanagan, Hettleman, Jalisi, Lafferty, Lam, McMillan, Morhaim, Oaks, Rosenberg, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, on or before December 31, 2017, to research and evaluate public and private health record and payment clearing houses, develop standards, determine specified information, and report its recommendations and funding requests to the General Assembly; requiring the Commission to establish for use in a pilot program a health record and payment clearing house on or before January 1, 2019; specifying the capabilities of the proposed health records and payment clearing house; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0750
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Health Record and Payment Clearing House - Pilot Program
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-150, 19-151 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM