Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Maryland Multicultural Youth Centers
Sponsored by
Delegates Gaines, Healey, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $200,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Latin American Youth Center, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Center for Educational Partnership of the Maryland Multicultural Youth Centers, located in Prince George's County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1017
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2017 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 191). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 191 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/16/2016 2/17/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM