Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Reports
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Angel, Barron, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 693
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Director of the Behavioral Health Administration by December 1 each year to submit a report on behavioral health services for children and young adults in the State to the Governor and the General Assembly; requiring the Social Services Administration by December 1 each year to submit a report on voluntary placement agreements for children and young adults in the State to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0977
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {466787/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {697071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 693
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Reports
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {466787/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Reports
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {697071/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Reports
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 693
Text - Chapter - Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Reports
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-505.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM