Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Brooks, Guyton, and Jalisi
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program in the Department of Human Services to provide assistance to certain critical medically vulnerable individuals and their households with the application process for certain social services in Baltimore County and the City of Baltimore through certain navigators; requiring the Department to implement and administer the Pilot Program in partnership with certain agencies and organizations; terminating the Act after October 31, 2023; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Critical Medical Needs Program Expansion Pilot Program - Social Services
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-5A-08, 5-5A-08.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:38 PM