Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners Associations - Assessments - Lien Priority
Sponsored by
Delegates Johnson, Arikan, Jalisi, and Shetty
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a certain portion of a homeowners association's lien on a lot shall be enforced in accordance with a certain provision of the Maryland Contract Lien Act; and requiring the amount of certain liens to be paid to the governing body of a homeowners association before the disposition of funds to a lot owner under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Homeowners Associations - Assessments - Lien Priority
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Homeowners Associations - Assessments - Lien Priority
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 11:06 AM