Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Baltimore City - Babe Ruth Birthplace and Museum
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 to provide that a specified grant for the Babe Ruth Birthplace and Museum may not terminate before June 1, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Prior authorizations that were altered during the 2013 Session were amended into the Omnibus Bill (HB 1372). Individual prior authorizations were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 1372 to alter prior authorizations.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (132-2)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (132-2) 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 40
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2005, 2012 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM