Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation
Sponsored by
Delegate Reznik
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating an exception to a specified statement of need requirement for the temporary relocation of an existing licensed residential child care program if the temporary site meets the requirements of the residential child care program's license and other specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1107
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {806286/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {806286/1 Report Adopted 57
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 58
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 55
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2014 4/03/2014 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-703.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM