Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis, Sanchez, and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a definition of "disseminate" to exclude providing information to victims of crime or their representatives; altering the purposes of specified provisions of law relating to the Criminal Justice Information System; and requiring the Department of Information Technology to conduct a study relating to interfaces used for automated victim notification and to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1025
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-201, 10-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM