Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Sanchez, Pena-Melnyk, Angel, D. Barnes, Brooks, Cullison, Fennell, Frick, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, Knotts, Korman, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Mosby, Queen, Rosenberg, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valderrama, A. Washington, Wilson, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility requirements for an individual to be certified by the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission as a police officer to require an individual to be either a United States citizen or a permanent legal resident of the United States who is an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces and who pledges to apply for or obtain United States citizenship within 6 years of the employment start date with the law enforcement agency.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0344
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {752115/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-53)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {752115/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (84-53) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM