Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Patuxent River - Drifting Gill Nets
Sponsored by
Delegate O'Donnell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception to the prohibition against setting or hauling a drifting gill net in the Patuxent River south of the Patuxent River/Benedict Bridge by authorizing the setting or hauling of a drifting gill net in that area of the river to catch white perch.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (136-1)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (136-1) 43
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 43
House 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM