Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Staff Agencies - Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegates Hammen and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering provisions of law that apply to nursing staff agencies and nursing personnel to apply more broadly to health care staff agencies and specified health care practitioners licensed or certified by specified health occupation boards; requiring a health care staff agency to be licensed by the Office of Health Care Quality in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene before referring specified health care practitioners to a health care facility to render temporary health care services in the State; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1057
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Hammen) Adopted (129-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {706288/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Hammen) Adopted (129-0) 44
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 44
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments {706288/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-2001, 19-2002, 19-2301, 19-2302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM