Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents - Required Redemption
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a redeemable ground rent to be redeemed when the property subject to the ground rent is transferred or the leasehold tenant obtains or refinances a loan on the property; requiring the transferee or borrower to request a redemption statement from the ground lease holder if the ground lease is registered with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; requiring the ground lease holder to send a redemption statement containing specified information within 60 days after receiving a request; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0637 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM