Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Aumann, Brooks, Cluster, Ebersole, Grammer, Hettleman, Jalisi, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lisanti, Luedtke, Metzgar, Miele, Sydnor, West, K. Young, Afzali, Long, and Patterson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for specified construction material or warehousing equipment purchased for use in a specified target redevelopment area in Baltimore County under specified circumstances; requiring a buyer claiming the exemption to provide to the vendor evidence of eligibility issued by the Comptroller; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1062
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {285765/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {679237/1
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Brochin) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {679237/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {285765/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {679237/1 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Brochin) Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {679237/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-232 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM