Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Commission to study certain matters and make certain recommendations regarding non-emergency medical transportation and locally operated transit systems; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Commission to Study Non-Emergency Medical Transportation Funding
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM