Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Waste Haulers - Reporting Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, R. Lewis, Lierman, and Mosby
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning on January 1, 2021, a waste hauler to report on a semiannual basis to the Department of the Environment on certain information regarding waste collected or hauled; requiring a waste hauler to keep a copy of the report for at least 5 years; requiring a certain report to include certain information; requiring a waste hauler to, on request by the Department and within 30 days after the request is made, provide to the Department certain documents or allow the Department to take certain actions and examine the documents; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Waste Haulers - Reporting Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - Waste Haulers - Reporting Requirement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1701, 9-201, 9-2301 through 9-2305 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:39 PM