Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Bagnall, Carr, Cullison, Kipke, Krebs, Pena-Melnyk, and Reznik
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council to study and make recommendations to the Governor's Grants Office and the Board of Public Works regarding the entire life cycle of a grant and the creation of certain materials for use by certain grant-making agencies, grant applicants, and grant recipients; requiring the Board to adopt by regulation a uniform grant application form, uniform financial controls and reporting requirements, and uniform performance progress reporting requirements on or before July 1, 2021: etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0630
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/13/2020 4:43 PM