Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing an exception for the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund from specified provisions of law governing the imposition of a specified premium tax; altering the scope of provisions of law governing prior approval rate making to exclude the Fund; providing that provisions of law governing competitive rating rate making apply to the Fund under specified circumstances; repealing a provision of law that makes the Fund subject to the provisions of the Open Meetings Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0910
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
House 4/06/2017 4/07/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
(   11-303, 20-201, 20-304, 20-502, 20-507, 20-509, 20-513, 20-514, 20-516, 6-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page