Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Newborn Screening Program Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell, Hubbard, Hammen, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Elliott, Kach, A. Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Newborn Screening Program Fund; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to administer the Fund; providing for the uses, purposes, sources of funding, investment of money, and auditing of the Fund; providing that the Fund is a continuing, nonlapsing fund not subject to specified provisions of law; requiring the Secretary to pay specified fees to the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to distribute the specified fees to the Newborn Screening Program Fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {336887/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {307873/1
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {307873/1
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {307873/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {307873/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (136-0) 42
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 42
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {336887/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {307873/1 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {307873/1 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable with Amendments {307873/1 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {307873/1 Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 66A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-111, 13-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM