Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Property Tax Exemption - Garrett College Business Incubator
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Garrett County to exempt from the county property tax specified real property in Garrett County that is owned by the Garrett College Board of Trustees and used as a specified business incubator; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1080
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
(   7-511.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page