Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation - Governance - Medical Center Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates Conway, M. Washington, and DeBoy
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Directors of the University of Maryland Medical System Corporation to establish a nonprofit subsidiary to operate all or a part of the University of Maryland Medical Center in order to bring specified Medical Center employees within the jurisdiction of the National Labor Relations Act; authorizing the Medical System Corporation, on or after October 1, 2014, to amend its articles of incorporation to add up to three voting members to the Board of Directors; honoring specified collective bargaining agreements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1104
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Conway) Adopted (129-1)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate Conway) Adopted (131-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {834764/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Schuh) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-38)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Conway) Adopted (129-1) 43
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate Conway) Adopted (131-0) 43
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Referred Appropriations 43
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {834764/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate Schuh) Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (96-38) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (39-8) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-302, 13-303, 13-304, 13-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM