Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Cedar Lane Senior Living Community Project - Phase 4
Sponsored by
Delegates Wood and Bohanan
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $170,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Friends of Cedar Lane, Inc. for specified development or improvement purposes related to the Cedar Lane Senior Living Community facilities, located in St. Mary's County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1109
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2015 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 171). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 171 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Wood) Adopted (126-3)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate Wood) Adopted (126-3)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Wood) Adopted (126-3) 43A
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate Wood) Adopted (126-3) 43A
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Referred Appropriations 43A
House 3/20/2014 3/20/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM