Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Prince George's County Local Management Board to develop and implement a strategic plan to raise revenues to match the total funding provided by the Governor's Office for Children by January 1, 2018; requiring the Local Management Board to submit a specified report by January 1 each year; requiring Prince George's County to study the feasibility of converting the Local Management Board into a quasi-public nonprofit corporation and the leveraging of specified funds by specified quasi-public nonprofit corporations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {890210/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan and Report PG 426-17
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {890210/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Referred Rules 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 4/06/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page