Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zones - Extraordinary Development District
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Commerce to designate, in a calendar year, an additional BRAC Revitalization and Incentive Zone that includes a specified extraordinary development district in which a federal law enforcement agency is located; increasing by one the number of BRAC Zones a county may receive if the zone includes a specified development district; increasing from 10 to 20 the number of years the Secretary may designate a specified area as a BRAC Zone if the zone includes a specified development district; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1066
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters and Ways and Means
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1301, 5-1304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM