Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Angel, Barkley, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Lam, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Robinson, West, K. Young, P. Young, Bromwell, Krebs, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing, with a certain exception, a pharmacist to dispense, in a single dispensing and exercising the pharmacist's professional judgment, a quantity of a prescription drug that is up to a certain number of authorized dosage units and does not exceed a 90-day supply of the prescription drug; providing that the Act does not apply to a certain controlled dangerous substance or certain prescriptions that an authorized prescriber prescribes for a patient; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1159 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {896185/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {896185/1 Adopted 48
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text - Chapter - Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM