Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Ali, Conaway, Gibson, Glenn, Hayes, Lierman, McCray, and Mosby
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore City Department of Public Works to establish a formal administrative review process by which a customer may file a claim for review of the customer's bill; requiring the Department to designate a third party to review and render a final decision on each claim; requiring the Department to review the Department's water and sewer billing program periodically; requiring the establishment of a quality assurance and control committee to make recommendations on improvements to certain processes, policies and services; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {340910/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process and Report
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {340910/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and Report
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Referred Rules 62
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   II (70), II (71) )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM