Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption
Sponsored by
Delegates Glass, Ciliberti, Hornberger, McComas, Parrott, Shoemaker, Vogt, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual who adopts a cat or a dog from an animal shelter or a rescue facility a maximum credit of $100 against the State income tax; providing that an individual may not claim the credit for more than 1 taxable year with respect to the same cat or dog; requiring the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1302 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM