Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of Dwelling
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker and Rose
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Increasing from 2 years to 10 years the number of years within which a disabled law enforcement officer or rescue worker must have acquired specified residential property in order to qualify for a specified property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on the property; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2016.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1276 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page