Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County School System Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Task Force PG 416-17
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Prince George's County School System Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Task Force; providing for the chairs and staff for the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation but entitling members to reimbursement for specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to make specified recommendations, including recommendations regarding the method of selecting the Prince George's County Board of Education, by October 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Prince George's County School System Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Task Force PG 416-17
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM