Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015 and 2016
Sponsored by
Delegate Otto
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015 to add the Board of Directors of the Delmarva Discovery Center & Museum, Inc. as a grantee to a specified grant; amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 to repeal the matching fund requirement for a specified grant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1033
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134465/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {134465/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2015, 2016 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM