Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Attorney General - Federal Government Lawsuits - Itemized Budget System
Sponsored by
Delegate McDonough
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Attorney General to create and maintain an itemized budget system for the accounting and use of funds spent in furtherance of lawsuits against the federal government; specifying that the itemized budget system shall be made available to the public under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Attorney General - Federal Government Lawsuits - Itemized Budget System
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM