Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solar Electric Generating Facility – Notice of Sale or Transfer
Sponsored by
Delegate Arentz
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that an owner of a certain solar electric generating facility provide certain notice of the sale or transfer of the facility to certain entities no later than 30 days after selling or otherwise transferring ownership; and requiring the notice of the sale or transfer to include the name, address, phone number, and e-mail address of the new owner.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Solar Electric Generating Facility – Notice of Sale or Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {993794/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Solar Electric Generating Facility – Notice of Sale or Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {337173/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Solar Electric Generating Facility – Notice of Sale or Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Solar Electric Generating Facility – Notice of Sale or Transfer
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Solar Electric Generating Facility – Notice of Sale or Transfer
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {993794/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Solar Electric Generating Facility – Notice of Sale or Transfer
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Finance 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {337173/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Solar Electric Generating Facility – Notice of Sale or Transfer
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Text - Chapter - Solar Electric Generating Facility – Notice of Sale or Transfer
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page