Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expressing the sense of the General Assembly that facial recognition technology can present certain risks as well as provide a variety of benefits and that safeguards are necessary to allow the use of the technology in ways that benefit society; establishing certain requirements and certain prohibited actions relating to provision of facial recognition services by certain persons; prohibiting certain governmental units from using facial recognition services under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0476
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   14-4201 through 14-4207 )
(   10-1701 through 10-1709 )
Last Updated: 3/14/2020 12:10 PM