Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Pinecrest Local Park Improvements
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Moon, and Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $100,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Pinecrest Local Park, located in Montgomery County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1105
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/23/2016 2/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM